SC H3644 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act No. 279
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act No. 279
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increase The Threshold Below Which The Annual Fee For The Job Retraining Credit Does Not Apply
Title
Clean Energy Industry Market Development Advisory Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Act No. 279 | |
2014-06-17 | Effective date See Act for Effective Date | |
2014-06-10 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-06-05 | Ratified R 297 | |
2014-06-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-78 Nays-18 |
2014-06-04 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-34 Nays-7 |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Amended |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Committed to Committee on Finance |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-02-05 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2014-02-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0 |
2014-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-22 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 1-28-14 |
2014-01-22 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2014-01-21 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2014-01-15 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 1-22-14 |
2014-01-15 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2013-06-18 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bowers |
2013-06-04 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 6-5-13 |
2013-05-15 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 5-16-13 |
2013-04-30 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2013-04-24 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2013-04-24 | House | Amended |
2013-04-18 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2013-04-09 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: J.E.Smith, W.J.McLeod, Williams, Vick, Funderburk, Sellers, Govan |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2013-03-07 | House | Recalled from Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2013-02-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.E.Smith |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2013-02-27 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0525 (Similar To) 2014-03-06 - Scrivener's error corrected
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 10 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 10 | 95 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 20 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 6 | 3588 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 6 | 3600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 6 | 3620 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 390 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |