SC H5023 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Roll call Yeas-85 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Roll call Yeas-85 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 56-1-219 So As To Establish The Work Zone Program Within The Department Of Public Safety; By Amending Section 56-1-15, Relating To The Administration Of Driver's License Examinations, So As To Require Driver's License Applicants Complete The Work Zone Safety Program Course; And By Amending Section 56-1-130, Relating To License Examinations And Basic And Classified Licenses, So As To Require Driver's License Applicants Complete The Work Zone Safety Program Course.
Title
Work Zone Safety Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-09 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-85 Nays-0 |
2024-05-09 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2024-05-08 | House | Debate adjourned |
2024-05-07 | House | Debate adjourned |
2024-05-02 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-7-24 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Transportation |
2024-03-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-03-27 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-03-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-120 Nays-0 |
2024-03-26 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-26 | House | Amended |
2024-03-21 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2024-03-05 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Nutt |
2024-02-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson, Pedalino, B.Newton |
2024-02-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Guffey, O'Neal |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2024-02-01 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S1076 (Similar To) 2024-05-01 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
56 | 1 | 130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 219 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |