SC S0689 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Act No. 267
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Act No. 267
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide A Location Where A Passenger May Ride Upon A Motorcycle, And To Provide That The Provisions Contained In This Section Do Not Apply To Persons Riding In A Motorcycle Sidecar
Title
Motor vehicle beginners permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 77 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 77 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Act No. 267 | |
2016-06-16 | Effective date 06/07/16 | |
2016-06-07 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-06-02 | Ratified R 223 | |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2016-05-25 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2016-05-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-05-24 | House | Roll call Yeas-77 Nays-18 |
2016-05-24 | House | Read second time |
2016-05-24 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2016-05-24 | House | Amended |
2016-05-19 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2016-04-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2016-04-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-33 Nays-0 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Transportation |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4673 (Similar To) 2016-01-26 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Taylor