SC S0900 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-08 - Act No. 323
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-08 - Act No. 323
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [HTML]
Summary
Create The "study Committee On Expungement Of Criminal Offenses" To Review The Criminal Laws Of The State And Determine Criminal Offenses Appropriate For Expungement, To Provide For The Membership And Staffing Of The Study Committee, And To Provide For The Study Committee's Termination
Title
Study Committee on Expungement of Criminal Offenses
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-08 | Act No. 323 | |
2014-05-27 | Effective date 05/16/14 | |
2014-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-05-15 | Ratified R 176 | |
2014-05-13 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2014-05-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-1 |
2014-05-08 | House | Read second time |
2014-05-06 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-7-14 |
2014-04-10 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-6-14 |
2014-04-03 | House | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-02 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2014-04-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted |
2014-03-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Corbin, Young |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2013-12-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-12-17 | Senate | Prefiled |