SC S1015 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Act No. 271
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Act No. 271
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Make Unlawful Certain Actions Involving Counterfeit Or Nonfunctional Airbags
Title
Counterfeit or nonfunctional airbags
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-01 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Act No. 271 | |
2016-06-16 | Effective date 06/09/16 | |
2016-06-09 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-06-06 | Ratified R 295 | |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2016-06-02 | House | House recedes from amendment |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Non-concurrence in House amendment |
2016-06-02 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2016-06-01 | House | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-1 |
2016-06-01 | House | Read second time |
2016-06-01 | House | Amended |
2016-05-31 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 6-1-16 |
2016-05-24 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2016-04-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-27 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-1 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2016-04-14 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Gregory (ch), Malloy, Turner |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |