TN HB0978 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1071
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1071
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Native Species Lumber Act." - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 43, Chapter 28, Part 3 and Title 68, Chapter 120.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Native Species Lumber Act." - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 43, Chapter 28, Part 3 and Title 68, Chapter 120.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 1071 | |
2016-05-23 | Effective date(s) 05/20/2016 | |
2016-05-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-05-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-22 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-04-20 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. SA1 Ayes 87, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB0978 |
2016-04-20 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 4/20/2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0190) |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-04-14 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-04-14 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-04-14 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0301) |
2016-04-14 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0961) |
2016-04-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2016 |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2016 |
2016-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-04-01 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Action def. in Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee to 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/10/2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0822 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1071