TN HB1046 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024, 07/01/2025
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024, 07/01/2025
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Rural and Workforce Housing Act." - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 53; Title 13; Title 48, Chapter 101, Part 3; Title 56 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7, Chapter 53; Title 13; Title 48, Chapter 101, Part 3; Title 56 and Title 67, relative to housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2024, 07/01/2025 | |
2024-05-28 | Pub. Ch. 971 | |
2024-05-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-05-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-05-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-30 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-25 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 2 Ayes 94, Nays 0 PNV 1 HB1046 |
2024-04-24 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/25/2024 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0426) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA1036) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-04-22 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-04-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-22 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 1, PNV 1 |
2024-04-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA1108) |
2024-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1065) |
2024-04-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0281) |
2024-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/17/2023 |
2023-04-10 | House | Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 4/17/2023 |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/10/2023 |
2023-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2023-03-15 | House | Ref. to Local Government Committee -- Government Operations for Review |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1000 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 971