TN HB2060 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 808
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 808
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes changes to the law relative to prescribing buprenorphine products. - Amends TCA Title 33 and Title 53.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33 and Title 53, relative to the treatment of opiate addiction.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Hicks [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Rebecca Alexander [R] | Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] |
Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 808 | |
2024-04-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-11 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2019 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024