TN HB3002 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, changes the appointing authority for vacancies on the Board of Directors of the Bolivar Energy Authority from the mayor to the members of the Board of Directors. - Amends Chapter 130 of the Private Acts of 2006.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 130 of the Private Acts of 2006; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to Bolivar Energy Authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-05-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-05-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-30 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-04-22 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-04-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 4 |
2024-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/9/2024 |
2024-04-02 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 4/9/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-03-21 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-03-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2985 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-24 - Companion House Bill substituted