TN HB3760 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1057
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1057
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases the maximum allowable exemption from the inheritance tax incrementally over next three years; eliminates the inheritance tax beginning in 2016. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 8.
Title
As enacted, increases the maximum allowable exemption from the inheritance tax incrementally over next three years; eliminates the inheritance tax beginning in 2016. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Herron (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Herron (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 1057 | |
2012-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/21/12 | |
2012-05-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2012-05-09 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2012-05-08 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-05-03 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2012-04-27 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 1 | |
2012-04-27 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2012-04-16 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2012-04-12 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2012-04-12 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 8 | |
2012-04-12 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA1087) | |
2012-04-12 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1086) | |
2012-04-10 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2012 | |
2012-04-09 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2012 | |
2012-04-03 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/3/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 3/21/2012 | |
2012-02-02 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2012-02-02 | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-30 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3762 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1057