TN HJR0810 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 59-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Governor Lee to deploy Tennessee National Guard to support Texas in its efforts to secure border.
Title
A RESOLUTION supporting the State of Texas's efforts to secure its border against the invasion of illegal immigration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 70 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2024-03-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-03-18 | House | Adopted as am., Ayes 70, Nays 23, PNV 0 |
2024-03-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-18 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0705) |
2024-03-14 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-06 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/21/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
2024-01-29 | House | Intro., ref. to State Government Committee |