TN SB1890 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1002
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1002
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the Tennessee athletic commission to authorize international qualifying events for kickboxing to occur in this state as long as the events meet the standards required for such events by the World Association of Kickboxing Organizations or any subsequent entity recognized as the official kickboxing governing body by the International World Games Association. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 115.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the Tennessee athletic commission to authorize international qualifying events for kickboxing to occur in this state as long as the events meet the standards required for such events by the World Association of Kickboxing Organizations or any subsequent entity recognized as the official kickboxing governing body by the International World Games Association. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 115.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Rule 39(3) Amend# 2 by Tate (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Rule 39(3) Amend# 2 by Tate (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 1002 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date(s) 05/21/2018 | |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 86, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2018-04-24 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1270) |
2018-04-24 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0881) |
2018-04-24 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0863) |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA1163) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/16/18 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/4/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2018 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/6/2018 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
Same As/Similar To
HB1882 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1002