TN SB3315 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that if a treating physician determines that pain is persisting for an injured or disabled employee beyond an expected period for healing, then the treating physician, if the physician is a "qualified physician", may either prescribe or refer such employee for pain management, encompassing pharmacological, non-pharmacological and other approaches to manage chronic pain. - Amends TCA Title 29; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 56.
Title
As enacted, specifies that if a treating physician determines that pain is persisting for an injured or disabled employee beyond an expected period for healing, then the treating physician, if the physician is a "qualified physician", may either prescribe or refer such employee for pain management, encompassing pharmacological, non-pharmacological and other approaches to manage chronic pain. - Amends TCA Title 29; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 56.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 1100 | |
2012-05-29 | Effective date(s) 07/01/12 | |
2012-05-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2012-05-09 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-05-08 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-05-04 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2012-05-01 | Passed H., Ayes 86, Nays 3 | |
2012-05-01 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA1402) | |
2012-05-01 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1222) | |
2012-05-01 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2012-04-27 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 26, Nays 3 | |
2012-04-27 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1024) | |
2012-04-27 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA1303) | |
2012-04-27 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2012-04-26 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/27/2012 | |
2012-04-24 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2012-04-24 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-23 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-23 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-20 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/23/2012 | |
2012-04-19 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/23/2012 | |
2012-04-19 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/19/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/19/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/18/2012 | |
2012-04-17 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/18/2012 | |
2012-04-11 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/17/2012 | |
2012-04-10 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/17/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/10/2012 | |
2012-03-28 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 3/28/2012 | |
2012-03-27 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/28/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-20 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 3/20/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/20/2012 | |
2012-03-09 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 3/13/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2012-01-30 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3372 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1100