TN SB3545 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1104
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1104
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the deadline for the Niswonger Children's Hospital special license plate to meet the minimum order requirement to July 1, 2013. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, extends the deadline for the Niswonger Children's Hospital special license plate to meet the minimum order requirement to July 1, 2013. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - Senate - S. T&S COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - Senate - S. T&S COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 1104 | |
2012-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/21/12 | |
2012-05-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2012-05-09 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-05-08 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-05-04 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2012-05-01 | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0 | |
2012-05-01 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1029) | |
2012-05-01 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2012-04-02 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2012-03-29 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 28, Nays 0 | |
2012-03-29 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0951) | |
2012-03-29 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2012-03-27 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/29/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on S. T&S Comm. cal. for 3/21/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Action Def. in S. T&S Comm. to 3/21/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on S. T&S Comm. cal. for 3/14/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Action Def. in S. T&S Comm. to 3/14/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on S. T&S Comm. cal. for 3/7/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. T&S Comm. | |
2012-01-30 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3763 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1104