TN SJR1135 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: House Delayed Bills Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: House Delayed Bills Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Opposes the United States' participation in the World Health Organization Pandemic Prevention Preparedness and Response Accord.
Title
A RESOLUTION relative to the World Health Organization Pandemic Prevention Preparedness and Response Accord.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] |
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-11 | House | Ref. to Delayed Bills Committee |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 26, Nays 4, PNV 1 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |