TN SJR1534 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Ref. to Delayed Bills Committee
Pending: House Delayed Bills Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Ref. to Delayed Bills Committee
Pending: House Delayed Bills Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
U.S. 70, Broadway of America
Title
A RESOLUTION to recognize U.S. 70 as the "Broadway of America."
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Ref. to Delayed Bills Committee |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/24/2024 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |