US HB2076 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-14 - Became Public Law No: 112-265.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-14 - Became Public Law No: 112-265.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Investigative Assistance for Violent Crimes Act of 2012 - Authorizes the Attorney General (AG), at the request of an appropriate law enforcement official of a state or political subdivision, to assist in the investigation of violent acts and shootings occurring in a place of public use, and in the investigation of mass killings and attempted mass killings. Defines "mass killings" as three or more killings in a single incident. Authorizes the AG to pay rewards of up to $3 million (currently, $2 million), subject to exceptions, for assistance to the Department of Justice (DOJ). Amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to permit the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS), at the request of an appropriate law enforcement official of a state or political subdivision and through deployment of the Secret Service or U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE), to assist in the investigation of violent acts and shootings occurring in a place of public use, and in the investigation of mass killings and attempted mass killings. Requires that any assistance provided under this Act be presumed to be within the scope of federal office or employment.
Title
Investigative Assistance for Violent Crimes Act of 2012
Sponsors
Rep. Trey Gowdy [R-SC] | Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-12 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 358 N: 9 NV: 64 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-14 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 112-265. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2013-01-01 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-01-01 | Senate | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (consideration: CR H7560; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR 12/31/2012 H7491-7492) |
2012-12-31 | Senate | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Scott (VA) objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2012-12-31 | Senate | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 2076. |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Mr. Gowdy moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H7491-7495) |
2012-12-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2012-12-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2012-12-17 | Senate | The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8089; text: CR S8089) |
2012-12-17 | Senate | S.AMDT.3342 Amendment SA 3342 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2012-12-17 | Senate | S.AMDT.3342 Amendment SA 3342 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Whitehouse. (consideration: CR S8089; text: CR S8089)In the nature of a substitute. |
2012-12-17 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S8089) |
2011-11-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 236. |
2011-11-17 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2011-11-17 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2011-09-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2011-09-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-09-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 358 - 9 (Roll no. 699). (text: CR H6046) |
2011-09-12 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6050-6051) |
2011-09-12 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2011-09-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2076. |
2011-09-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6046-6047) |
2011-09-12 | House | Mr. Gowdy moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2011-07-29 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 121. |
2011-07-29 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-186. |
2011-07-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2011-07-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-07-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2011-06-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1793 (Same As) 2012-12-18 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Law enforcement administration and funding
Violent crime
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Law enforcement administration and funding
Violent crime