US HB443 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-14 - Became Public Law No: 112-263.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-14 - Became Public Law No: 112-263.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to convey specified property, including all land appurtenances, in Kotzebue, Alaska, to the Maniilaq Association for use in connection with health and social services programs. Requires such conveyance to be made by a warranty deed without consideration and without imposing any obligation, term, or condition, on the Maniilaq Association, or U.S. reversionary interest, other than that as required by this Act or under the Indian Self-Determination and Education Assistance Act. Supersedes and renders of no future effect the Secretary's conveyance of title on any quitclaim deed for such properties that was executed by the Secretary and the Maniilaq Association. Shields the Maniilaq Association from liability for soil, surface water, groundwater, or other contamination resulting from the disposal, release, or presence of environmental contamination, including oil or petroleum products, or hazardous substances on any of the property on or before the date on which all of the properties were conveyed by quitclaim deed. Accords to the Secretary any easement or access to the conveyed property as may be necessary to satisfy any retained obligations and liability. Requires the Secretary to be in compliance with requirements under the Comprehensive Environmental Response, Compensation, and Liability Act of 1980 (CERCLA) respecting certain deeds for the transfer of U.S. owned real property on which any hazardous substance was stored for one year or more, disposed of, or known to have been released.
Title
To provide for the conveyance of certain property from the United States to the Maniilaq Association located in Kotzebue, Alaska.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
Roll Calls
2013-01-01 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Concur in the Senate Amendment (Y: 410 N: 5 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-15 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 407 N: 4 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-15 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 407 N: 4 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-14 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 112-263. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2013-01-01 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-01-01 | Senate | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 5 (Roll no. 656). (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR 12/31/2012 H7491) |
2013-01-01 | Senate | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7530) |
2012-12-31 | Senate | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Grijalva objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2012-12-31 | Senate | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 443. |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Mr. Young (AK) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H7491) |
2012-12-21 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2012-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2012-12-20 | Senate | S.AMDT.3423 Amendment SA 3423 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2012-12-20 | Senate | S.AMDT.3423 Amendment SA 3423 proposed by Senator Durbin for Senator Murkowski. (consideration: CR S8308; text: CR S8308)In the nature of a substitute. |
2012-12-20 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S8308) |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 566. |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Akaka without amendment. With written report No. 112-250. |
2012-06-28 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
2011-12-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-12-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 407 - 4 (Roll no. 936). (text: CR 12/14/2011 H8948-8949) |
2011-12-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8992-8993) |
2011-12-14 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Hastings (WA) objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. |
2011-12-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 443. |
2011-12-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8948-8949) |
2011-12-14 | House | Mr. Hastings (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2011-12-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 216. |
2011-12-08 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2011-12-08 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-318, Part I. |
2011-10-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2011-10-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-10-05 | House | Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged. |
2011-09-22 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2011-02-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-02-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2011-01-25 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2011-01-25 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2011-01-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1898 (Related) 2012-03-22 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 112-635.
Subjects
Alaska
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Health facilities and institutions
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Health facilities and institutions
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations