US HB6060 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-14 - Became Public Law No: 112-270.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-14 - Became Public Law No: 112-270.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Endangered Fish Recovery Programs Extension Act of 2012 - Extends through FY2019 the authority of the Secretary of the Interior to use power revenues collected pursuant to the Colorado River Storage Project Act for annual base funding of endangered fish recovery implementation programs for the Upper Colorado and San Juan River Basins. Sets forth restrictions with respect to the indirect cost recovery rate for any transfer of funds to the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service from another federal agency for the purpose of funding any activity associated with such programs. Prohibits the use of federal funds to cover expenses incurred by an employee or detailee of the Department of the Interior to travel to any location (other than the field office to which that individual is otherwise assigned) to advocate, lobby, or attend meetings that advocate or lobby for such programs.
Title
Endangered Fish Recovery Programs Extension Act of 2012
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] |
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Rep. Jim Matheson [D-UT] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] |
Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-14 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 112-270. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2013-01-01 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2013-01-01 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 12/31/2012 S8609) |
2013-01-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 12/31/2012 S8609) |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2012-09-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-09-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6074) |
2012-09-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6060. |
2012-09-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6074-6075) |
2012-09-19 | House | Mr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2012-09-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 484. |
2012-09-14 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-672. |
2012-08-01 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2012-08-01 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2012-08-01 | House | Subcommittee on Water and Power Discharged. |
2012-07-10 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2012-06-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power. |
2012-06-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Aquatic ecology
Colorado
Department of the Interior
Endangered and threatened species
Executive agency funding and structure
Fishes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Public participation and lobbying
Transportation costs
Utah
Wyoming
Colorado
Department of the Interior
Endangered and threatened species
Executive agency funding and structure
Fishes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Public participation and lobbying
Transportation costs
Utah
Wyoming