US SB3738 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 366.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 366.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to reauthorize the Great Lakes Restoration Initiative, and for other purposes.
Title
GLRI Act of 2024 Great Lakes Restoration Initiative Act of 2024
Sponsors
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. J.D. Vance [R-OH] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. John Fetterman [D-PA] |
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 366. |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. Without written report. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7257 (Same As) 2024-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.