UT HB1001 | 2011 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal of H.B. 477, 2011 Annual General Session
Title
Repeal of H.B. 477, 2011 Annual General Session
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2011-03-28 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-03-28 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2011-03-28 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2011-03-28 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-25 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-25 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-25 | House/ intent language in HSPKR | |
2011-03-25 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2011-03-25 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2011-03-25 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2011-03-25 | Senate/ intent language in HSPKR | |
2011-03-25 | Senate/ recedes from Senate amendment in SPRES | |
2011-03-25 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-03-25 | Senate/ received from House in SSEC | |
2011-03-25 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2011-03-25 | House/ refuse to concur with Senate amendment in SSEC | |
2011-03-25 | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL | |
2011-03-25 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2011-03-25 | Senate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK | |
2011-03-25 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK | |
2011-03-25 | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND | |
2011-03-25 | Senate/ 1st, 2nd, & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2011-03-25 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2011-03-25 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2011-03-25 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2011-03-25 | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-25 | House/ circled in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-25 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-25 | House/ 1st & 2nd readings/ suspension in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-25 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HINTRO | |
2011-03-25 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-03-24 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2011-03-24 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in LRGC | |
2011-03-24 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-03-24 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-03-24 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2011-03-24 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-03-24 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-03-24 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |