UT HB2002 | 2018 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-21 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-21 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repatriation Tax Amendments
Title
Repatriation Tax Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-18 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-07-18 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-07-18 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-21 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2018-07-19 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2018-07-19 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2018-07-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2018-07-19 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-07-19 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-07-18 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-07-18 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2018-07-18 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2018-07-18 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2018-07-18 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President |
2018-07-18 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-07-18 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-07-18 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2018-07-18 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2018-07-18 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2018-07-18 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-07-18 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-07-18 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-07-18 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-07-18 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Docket Clerk |
2018-07-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-07-18 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Clerk of the House |
2018-07-18 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-07-18 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-07-17 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-07-17 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-07-17 | House | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in House Substituted Bill |