UT SB0116 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Became Law w/o Governor Signature in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Became Law w/o Governor Signature in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public School Dropout Recovery
Title
Public School Dropout Recovery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 64 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 64 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Became Law w/o Governor Signature in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2015-03-23 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2015-03-18 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2015-03-16 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2015-03-13 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2015-03-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2015-03-12 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2015-03-12 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2015-03-12 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2015-03-12 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2015-03-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2015-03-12 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2015-03-12 | House | House/ substituted from # 3 to # 5 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2015-03-12 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2015-03-12 | House | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2015-03-12 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2015-03-12 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2015-03-12 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2015-03-11 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2015-03-09 | House | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2015-03-06 | House | House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in House Rules Committee |
2015-03-06 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2015-03-06 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Education Committee |
2015-03-05 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in House Education Committee |
2015-03-05 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Education Committee |
2015-03-05 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in House Education Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Education Committee |
2015-03-02 | House | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2015-03-02 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2015-03-02 | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-02 | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-02 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Education Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Education Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in Senate Education Committee |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Education Committee |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate Education Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Education Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2015-01-28 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-01-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |