VA HB2005 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-7)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0754)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-7)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0754)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Housing Partnership Revolving Fund. Renames the Virginia Housing Partnership Revolving Fund to the Virginia Housing Trust Fund and codifies language in the latest appropriation act in which $7 million was appropriated to the Fund. The bill provides that the Department of Housing and Community Development shall (i) work in collaboration with the Virginia Housing Development Authority (HDA) to provide loan origination and servicing activities as needed to carry out the purposes of the Fund, with the costs of such services to be considered an eligible use of the Fund, and (ii) use, through HDA, at least 80 percent of the moneys from the Fund to provide flexible financing for low-interest loans through eligible organizations. Such loans shall be structured to maximize leveraging opportunities. All such funds shall be repaid to the credit of the Fund. Loans may be provided for (a) affordable rental housing to include new construction, rehabilitation, repair, or acquisition of housing to assist low or moderate income citizens, including land and land improvements; (b) down payment and closing cost assistance for homebuyers; and (c) short-term, medium-term, and long-term loans to reduce the cost of homeownership and rental housing. The bill also allows the Department to use up to 20 percent of the moneys from the Fund to provide grants through eligible organizations for targeted efforts to reduce homelessness, including (1) temporary rental assistance, not to exceed one year; (2) housing stabilization services in permanent supportive housing for homeless individuals and homeless families; (3) mortgage foreclosure counseling targeted at localities with the highest incidence of foreclosure activity; and (4) predevelopment assistance for permanent supportive housing and other long-term housing options for the homeless. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Virginia Housing Partnership Revolving Fund; renamed Virginia Housing Trust Fund, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 1-N) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 1-N) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0754) | |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 754 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB2005ER2) |
2013-04-03 | House | Reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 1-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (92-Y 1-N) |
2013-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-25 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2005ER) |
2013-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2005H2 |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 13104819D-H2 |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee on General Laws substitute rejected 13104500D-H1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104819D-H2 |
2013-02-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | House | Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-01-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104500D-H1 |
2013-01-24 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103357D |