VA HB757 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Education; model policies on parental review of instructional material; local adoption. Requires the Board of Education to adopt and distribute to each school board model policies requiring any instructional material used in any public elementary or secondary school in the Commonwealth to be open for inspection during normal business hours by the parents of students enrolled in the relevant public school, regardless of the copyright status of any such material. The bill requires each school board to adopt policies that are consistent with such model policies adopted by the Board.
Title
Education, Board of; model policies on parental review of instructional material, local adoption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Education |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) |
2024-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102531D |