VA SB651 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-6)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0824)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-6)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0824)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Office of the Attorney General; employment of outside counsel where a conflict of interests exists. Requires the Attorney General's office to enter into an agreement with outside counsel to provide legal services in a matter when the Attorney General certifies to the Governor that it would be improper for his office to do so because a conflict of interests exists. The compensation for the legal services provided shall be based upon a reasonable fee and shall be expended from funds appropriated to the Attorney General's office.
Title
Attorney General, Office of; employment of outside counsel where a conflict of interests exists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (27-Y 66-N) (Y: 27 N: 68 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Petersen rejected (10-Y 30-N) (Y: 10 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Petersen rejected (10-Y 30-N) (Y: 10 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0824) | |
2014-05-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 824 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-04-23 | House | Communicated to Governor |
2014-04-23 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (27-Y 66-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | House rejected Governor's recommendation (27-Y 66-N) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (20-Y 19-N) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-06 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB651ER) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-28 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2014-02-26 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-21 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Ethics |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB651S1 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Petersen rejected (10-Y 30-N) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104432D-S1 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Incorporates SB220 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104432D-S1 |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Rules |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 14103396D |
Same As/Similar To
HB220 (Similar To) 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
SB220 (Similar To) 2014-01-24 - Incorporated by Rules
SB220 (Similar To) 2014-01-24 - Incorporated by Rules