VA SB775 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0771)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0771)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unemployment compensation; noncharging of overpayments; penalty for fraudulent claims. Provides that an employer shall not be relieved from a claimant's benefit charges relating to an overpayment of unemployment benefits when the employer has established a pattern of failing to respond timely or adequately to such requests. A similar requirement is established for reimbursable employing units. A pattern of failing to respond timely or adequately to such requests exists if an employer fails to respond adequately to a request for information four times in a four-year period. After the first three such failures, the Virginia Employment Commission (VEC) is required to give the employer a notice, and is required to assess a $75 civil penalty for a third failure. The VEC is required to monitor the implementation of this provision and report its findings periodically to the Commission on Unemployment Compensation. The measure also provides that any person who is disqualified for unemployment benefits as a result of a fraudulent act or omission shall be assessed a penalty of 15 percent of the amount of any unemployment benefits received for which he was not entitled. Finally, the measure allows benefit overpayments and penalties to be recovered through offsets and eliminates the provision that makes individuals who have obtained benefits as the result of fraud ineligible for benefits until such benefits have been repaid. The enactment of a noncharging provision and a fraud penalty are required pursuant to the federal Trade Adjustment Assistance Extension Act of 2011. The measure is a recommendation of the Commission on Unemployment Compensation.
Title
Unemployment compensation; noncharging of overpayments, penalty for fraudulent claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0771) | |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 771 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB775ER2) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2013-04-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (93-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB775ER) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-07 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) |
2012-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2012-12-18 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100415D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 2 | 528.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
60 | 2 | 618 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
60 | 2 | 619 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
60 | 2 | 636 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |