VA SB819 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Tourist Train Development Authority. Reinstates the Authority and its board, repealed by the General Assembly in 2011, which will consist of representatives from the governing bodies of Tazewell County, the Town of Bluefield, and the Town of Pocahontas; four citizen members from Tazewell County; and two legislators. The Authority's powers are similar to those that other authorities possess. The Authority may also cooperate with any private or governmental entity in the state of West Virginia in the development of a tourist train.
Title
Tourist Train Development Authority; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 38-N) (Y: 59 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-25 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB819ER) |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-19 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 38-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed House (59-Y 38-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 3-N) |
2013-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) |
2013-02-11 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: #1 |
2013-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100878D |