VA SB926 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Office of the Attorney General; employment of special counsel. Limits the contingency fee that may be charged by special counsel employed by a state agency, depending on the amount recovered.
Title
Special counsel; contingency fees for those employed by a state agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (46-Y 51-N) (Y: 46 N: 51 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 8-N) (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 6-N) (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (46-Y 51-N) (Y: 46 N: 51 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 8-N) (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 6-N) (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Senate | Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto (19-Y 20-N) |
2018-03-19 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2018-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB926ER) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-28 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (51-Y 48-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed House (51-Y 48-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2018-02-28 | House | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by House |
2018-02-28 | House | VOTE: DEFEATED (46-Y 51-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Defeated by House (46-Y 51-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-28 | House | VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Taken up out of order pursuant to House Rule 52 (96-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (95-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Constitutional reading dispensed (95-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 10-N) |
2018-02-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-23 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 8-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-15 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB926S1 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106882D-S1 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106882D-S1 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 6-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 5-N) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18104273D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 510.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 510.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |