VT H0081 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Notice Calendar: Senate Proposal of Amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Notice Calendar: Senate Proposal of Amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to fair repair of agricultural equipment
Title
An act relating to fair repair of agricultural equipment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-05 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 137, Nays = 2 (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | House | Notice Calendar: Senate Proposal of Amendment |
2024-05-09 | House | Senate Message: Passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2024-05-08 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2024-05-07 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture agreed to |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Wrenner for Committee on Agriculture |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2024-05-03 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs relieved; bill committed to Committee on Agriculture on motion of Senator Ram Hinsdale |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-05-05 | House | Passed |
2023-05-05 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 137, Nays = 2 |
2023-05-05 | House | Rep. Marcotte of Coventry demanded yeas and nays |
2023-05-05 | House | Read third time |
2023-05-05 | House | Action Calendar: Third Reading |
2023-05-04 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2023-05-04 | House | Report of Committee on Agriculture, Food Resiliency, and Forestry, as amended, agreed to |
2023-05-04 | House | Report of Committee on Agriculture, Food Resiliency, and Forestry amended as recommended by Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2023-05-04 | House | Rep. Priestley of Bradford reported for the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2023-05-04 | House | Rep. Templeman of Brownington reported for the Committee on Agriculture, Food Resiliency, and Forestry |
2023-05-04 | House | Read second time |
2023-05-04 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2023-05-03 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2023-04-06 | House | Rep. Durfee of Shaftsbury moved to commit bill to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development, which was agreed to |
2023-04-06 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2023-04-05 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2023-01-20 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Food Resiliency, and Forestry |