VT H0289 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the Renewable Energy Standard
Title
An act relating to the Renewable Energy Standard
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-03 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Watson, Passed -- Needed 13 of 26 to Pass -- Yeas = 18, Nays = 8 (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 52, Nays = 90 (Y: 52 N: 90 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2024-03-20 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 99, Nays = 39 (Y: 99 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 52, Nays = 90 (Y: 52 N: 90 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2024-03-20 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 99, Nays = 39 (Y: 99 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2024-05-07 | House | Senate Message: Passed in concurrence |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator Williams proposal of amendment, disagreed to |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2024-05-06 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2024-05-03 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Watson, Passed -- Needed 13 of 26 to Pass -- Yeas = 18, Nays = 8 |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Bray for Committee on Finance |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Perchlik for Committee on Appropriations |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Bray for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-01 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Appropriations with the report of Committee on Natural Resources and Energy and Finance intact |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Cummings |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2024-03-21 | House | Read third time and passed |
2024-03-21 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 52, Nays = 90 |
2024-03-21 | House | Rep. Toof of St. Albans Town demanded yeas and nays |
2024-03-21 | House | Rep. Walker of Swanton and Harrison of Chittenden moved to amend the bill |
2024-03-21 | House | Rep. Galfetti of Barre Town asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2024-03-21 | House | Rep. Galfetti of Barre Town moved to amend the bill |
2024-03-21 | House | Action Calendar: Third Reading |
2024-03-20 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-03-20 | House | Report of Committee on Environment and Energy agreed to |
2024-03-20 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 99, Nays = 39 |
2024-03-20 | House | Rep. McCoy of Poultney demanded yeas and nays |
2024-03-20 | House | Rep. Dolan of Waitsfield recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-20 | House | Rep. Demrow of Corinth recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-03-20 | House | Rep. Sibilia of Dover reported for the Committee on Environment and Energy |
2024-03-20 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-20 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-03-19 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2024-02-22 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2024-02-07 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2023-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Environment and Energy |