VT H0730 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 7, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 7, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to alcoholic beverages and the Department of Liquor and Lottery
Title
An act relating to alcoholic beverages and the Department of Liquor and Lottery
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on June 7, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Signed by Governor on June 7, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on June 1, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-12 | House | Rules suspended and action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-12 | House | Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-05-12 | House | Rules suspended and taken up for immediate consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-12 | House | Notice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-11 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Senator(s) Ram Hinsdale motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment; text |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, as amended, agreed to |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Sirotkin; text |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations, as amended, agreed to |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations amended as moved by Senator(s) Brock |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs amended as recommended by Committee on Finance |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Westman for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Finance with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Ram Hinsdale for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Ram Hinsdale |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Brock |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sirotkin |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2022-05-11 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sirotkin |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sirotkin |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Finance with the report of Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs intact, on motion of Senator Sirotkin |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2022-03-24 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2022-03-24 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-03-23 | House | Report of Committee on Ways and Means agreed to |
2022-03-23 | House | Rep. Elder of Starksboro recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-03-23 | House | Rep. Birong of Vergennes spoke for the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs |
2022-03-23 | House | Read Second time |
2022-03-23 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-03-22 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2022-03-15 | House | Committee bill read first time |