VT H0766 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on May 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 20, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on May 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 20, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to prior authorization and step therapy requirements, health insurance claims, and provider contracts
Title
An act relating to prior authorization and step therapy requirements, health insurance claims, and provider contracts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-02 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 64 of 127 to Pass -- Yeas = 104, Nays = 23 (Y: 104 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 137, Nays = 0 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 137, Nays = 0 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 20, 2024 |
2024-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor on May 20, 2024 |
2024-05-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 14, 2024 |
2024-05-03 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2024-05-02 | House | Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2024-05-02 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 64 of 127 to Pass -- Yeas = 104, Nays = 23 |
2024-05-02 | House | Rep. McCoy of Poultney demanded yeas and nays |
2024-05-02 | House | Action Calendar: Senate Proposal of Amendment |
2024-05-01 | House | Notice Calendar: Senate Proposal of Amendment |
2024-04-30 | House | Senate Message: Passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator Lyons, Gulick, Hardy, Kitchel, and Williams proposal of amendment, agreed to |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator Lyons, Gulick, Hardy, Weeks, and Williams proposal of amendment, agreed to |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Lyons |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare, as amended, agreed to |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Motion to amend by Senator(s) Brock and Cummings disagreed to on division 12-16 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senator(s) Brock and Cummings motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare amended as moved by Senator(s) Lyons, Gulick, Hardy, Weeks, and Williams |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-04-23 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-03-13 | House | Passed |
2024-03-13 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 137, Nays = 0 |
2024-03-13 | House | Rep. Black of Essex demanded yeas and nays |
2024-03-13 | House | Read third time |
2024-03-13 | House | Action Calendar: Third Reading |
2024-03-12 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-03-12 | House | Report of Committee on Health Care agreed to |
2024-03-12 | House | Rep. Black of Essex reported for the Committee on Health Care |
2024-03-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-12 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-03-01 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-01-11 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Health Care |