VT H0847 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to peer support provider and recovery support specialist certification
Title
An act relating to peer support provider and recovery support specialist certification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 68 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 49, Nays = 87 (Y: 48 N: 87 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2024-02-27 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 67 of 133 to Pass -- Yeas = 39, Nays = 94 (Y: 39 N: 94 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2024-02-27 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 67 of 133 to Pass -- Yeas = 39, Nays = 94 (Y: 39 N: 94 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2024-05-08 | House | Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2024-05-08 | House | Rules suspended and taken up for immediate consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2024-05-08 | House | Notice Calendar: Senate Proposal of Amendment |
2024-05-07 | House | Senate Message: Passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2024-05-03 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2024-05-02 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Lyons for Committee on Appropriations |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator MacDonald for Committee on Finance |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Gulick for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-04-30 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-02-28 | House | Read third time and passed |
2024-02-28 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 68 of 135 to Pass -- Yeas = 48, Nays = 87 |
2024-02-28 | House | Rep. Labor of Morgan demanded yeas and nays |
2024-02-28 | House | Rep. Gregoire of Fairfield, Donahue of Northfield, Small of Winooski, and Whitman of Bennington moved to amend the bill |
2024-02-28 | House | Action Calendar: Third Reading |
2024-02-27 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-02-27 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 67 of 133 to Pass -- Yeas = 39, Nays = 94 |
2024-02-27 | House | Rep. Branagan of Georgia demanded yeas and nays |
2024-02-27 | House | Rep. Maguire of Rutland City moved to commit the bill to the Committee on Human Services |
2024-02-27 | House | Report of Committee on Ways and Means agreed to |
2024-02-27 | House | Rep. Toleno of Brattleboro recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-27 | House | Rep. Andrews of Westford recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-02-27 | House | Rep. Berbeco of Winooski spoke for the Committee on Health Care |
2024-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-27 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-02-23 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2024-02-16 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2024-02-06 | House | Read first time |