VT H0877 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 22, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 22, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Repeal Of Report Requirements That Are At Least Five Years
Title
An Act Relating To Repeal Of Report Requirements That Are At Least Five Years
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor on May 22, 2014 |
2014-05-09 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-05 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2014-05-03 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-05-02 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator McAllister for Committee on Government Operations |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2014-05-02 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Government Operations on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-03-21 | House | Passed |
2014-03-21 | House | Read Third time |
2014-03-21 | House | Which was agreed to |
2014-03-21 | House | Rep. Consejo of Sheldon moved to amend the bill |
2014-03-20 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-03-20 | House | Rep. Consejo of Sheldon moved to amend the bill which was agreed to |
2014-03-20 | House | Rep. Consejo of Sheldon spoke for the committee on Government Operations |
2014-03-20 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar for Notice on March 19, 2014 |