VT H0892 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 20, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 20, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Approval Of The Adoption And The Codification Of The Charter Of The Central Vermont Public Safety Authority
Title
An Act Relating To Approval Of The Adoption And The Codification Of The Charter Of The Central Vermont Public Safety Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor on May 20, 2014 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2014-05-08 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Pollina for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-08 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Government Operations on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed |
2014-04-29 | House | Read Third time |
2014-04-25 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-04-25 | House | Amendment of Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2014-04-25 | House | Rep. Lewis of Berlin reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2014-04-25 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-04-10 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |