VT H0952 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-08 - House message: Governor approved bill on October 8, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-08 - House message: Governor approved bill on October 8, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charters of the City of Burlington and the City of Barre
Title
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charters of the City of Burlington and the City of Barre
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-08 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on October 8, 2020 |
2020-10-08 | House | Signed by Governor on October 8, 2020 |
2020-10-05 | House | Delivered to the Governor on October 5, 2020 |
2020-09-25 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2020-09-25 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2020-09-24 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-09-18 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2020-09-18 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-09-18 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2020-09-18 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-09-18 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2020-09-18 | House | Rep. Anthony of Barre City reported for the committee on Ways and Means |
2020-09-18 | House | Read Second Time |
2020-09-18 | House | Rep. McCoy of Poultney moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration |
2020-09-17 | House | Rep. McCoy of Poultney moved that the bill be committed to the committee on Ways and Means which was agreed to. |
2020-09-16 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2020-09-16 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to. |
2020-09-16 | House | Rep. Hooper of Burlington reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2020-09-16 | House | Read Second Time |
2020-05-13 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |