VT H0962 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-08 - House message: Governor approved bill on October 8, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-08 - House message: Governor approved bill on October 8, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the duration of temporary relief from abuse orders
Title
An act relating to the duration of temporary relief from abuse orders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-08 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on October 8, 2020 |
2020-10-08 | House | Signed by Governor on October 8, 2020 |
2020-10-05 | House | Delivered to the Governor on October 5, 2020 |
2020-09-18 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2020-09-17 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2020-09-15 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2020-09-15 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2020-09-11 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2020-09-11 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2020-09-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Benning for Committee on Judiciary |
2020-09-11 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2020-09-11 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-06-18 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2020-06-18 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-06-18 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2020-06-18 | House | Rep. Grad of Moretown reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2020-06-18 | House | Read Second Time |
2020-06-10 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on June 10, 2020 |