VT S0025 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - As passed by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - As passed by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to regulating cosmetic and menstrual products containing certain chemicals and chemical classes and textiles and athletic turf fields containing perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances
Title
An act relating to regulating cosmetic and menstrual products containing certain chemicals and chemical classes and textiles and athletic turf fields containing perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances
Sponsors
Sen. Virginia Lyons [D] | Sen. Alison Clarkson [D] | Sen. Wendy Harrison [D] | Sen. Kesha Ram Hinsdale [D] |
Sen. Tanya Vyhovsky [D] | Sen. Anne Watson [D] | Sen. Rebecca White [D] | Sen. Irene Wrenner [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 65 of 130 to Pass -- Yeas = 130, Nays = 0 (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 65 of 129 to Pass -- Yeas = 101, Nays = 28 (Y: 101 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Lyons, Passed -- Needed 12 of 24 to Pass -- Yeas = 24, Nays = 0 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 65 of 129 to Pass -- Yeas = 101, Nays = 28 (Y: 101 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Lyons, Passed -- Needed 12 of 24 to Pass -- Yeas = 24, Nays = 0 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2024-05-09 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2024-05-07 | House | Senate proposal of amendment to the House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2024-05-07 | House | Action Calendar: Senate Proposal of Amendment to House Proposal of Amendment |
2024-05-06 | House | Rep. Whitman of Bennington moved to postpone action until 5/07/2024, which was agreed to |
2024-05-06 | House | Action Calendar: Unfinished Business |
2024-05-04 | House | Action Calendar: Senate Proposal of Amendment to House Proposal of Amendment |
2024-05-03 | House | Notice Calendar: Senate Proposal of Amendment to House Proposal of Amendment |
2024-05-02 | House | Senate Message: House proposal of amendment concurred in with further proposal of amendment thereto |
2024-05-01 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in with further proposal of amendment as moved by Senator(s) Lyons, Gulick, Hardy, Weeks, and Williams |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Lyons, Gulick, Hardy, Weeks, and Williams; text |
2024-05-01 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2024-04-17 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2024-04-16 | Senate | House proposal of amendment |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-04-12 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2024-04-11 | House | Passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2024-04-11 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 65 of 130 to Pass -- Yeas = 130, Nays = 0 |
2024-04-11 | House | Rep. Whitman of Bennington demanded yeas and nays |
2024-04-11 | House | Read third time |
2024-04-11 | House | Rep. Whitman of Bennington moved to amend the House proposal of amendment, which was agreed to |
2024-04-11 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 65 of 129 to Pass -- Yeas = 101, Nays = 28 |
2024-04-11 | House | Rep. Cole of Hartford demanded yeas and nays |
2024-04-11 | House | Rep. Higley of Lowell and Marcotte of Coventry moved to amend the House proposal of amendment |
2024-04-11 | House | Action Calendar: Third Reading |
2024-04-10 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-04-10 | House | Report of Committee on Human Services agreed to |
2024-04-10 | House | Rep. Whitman of Bennington reported for the Committee on Human Services |
2024-04-10 | House | Read second time |
2024-04-10 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-04-09 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2023-04-07 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Human Services |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Lyons, Passed -- Needed 12 of 24 to Pass -- Yeas = 24, Nays = 0 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2023-04-04 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Bray for Committee on Finance |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Williams for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |