VT S0090 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by Governor on May 27, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by Governor on May 27, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Representative Annual Meetings
Title
An Act Relating To Representative Annual Meetings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Signed by Governor on May 27, 2010 | |
2010-05-12 | Delivered to Governor on May 21, 2010 | |
2010-05-08 | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2010-05-08 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2010-05-08 | On motion of Senator White Senate receded from its proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment | |
2010-05-08 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2010-05-08 | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-05-07 | House message: adheres to House proposal of amendment & requests Senate to recede from Senate proposal of amendment | |
2010-05-06 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2010-05-06 | The House adheres to its proposal of Amendment and requests that the Senate recede from its proposal of amendment to the House proposal of amendment | |
2010-05-06 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2010-05-05 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2010-05-05 | House proposal of amendment concurred in with further proposal of amendment as moved by Senator(s) White | |
2010-05-05 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2010-05-05 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2010-05-05 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2010-05-05 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2010-05-05 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-05-05 | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2010-05-05 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2010-05-05 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Government Operations agreed to | |
2010-05-05 | Rep. Higley of Lowell reported for the committee on Government Operations | |
2010-05-05 | Read Second Time | |
2010-05-05 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2010-02-11 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations | |
2010-02-10 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2010-02-10 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2010-02-10 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2010-02-09 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2010-02-09 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2010-02-09 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to | |
2010-02-09 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to | |
2010-02-09 | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Doyle for Committee on Government Operations | |
2010-02-09 | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Doyle for Committee on Government Operations | |
2010-02-09 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2010-02-09 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2010-02-05 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2010-02-04 | Consideration postponed without objection | |
2010-02-04 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations | |
2010-02-04 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2010-02-03 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations | |
2009-02-17 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |