VT S0148 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Senate Message, signed by Governor May 31, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Senate Message, signed by Governor May 31, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to environmental justice in Vermont
Title
An act relating to environmental justice in Vermont
Sponsors
Sen. Kesha Ram Hinsdale [D] | Sen. Brian Campion [D] | Sen. Ruth Hardy [D] | Sen. Virginia Lyons [D] |
Sen. Christopher Pearson [D] | Sen. Andrew Perchlik [D] | Sen. Anthony Pollina [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 109, Nays = 31 (Y: 109 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Ram Hinsdale, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 1 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Ram Hinsdale, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 1 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Senate Message, signed by Governor May 31, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 31, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 25, 2022 |
2022-05-07 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended & action messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2022-05-06 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2022-05-06 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-05-06 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2022-05-06 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-05-05 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2022-05-05 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-05-04 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-04 | House | Read Third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-04 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-05-03 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-05-03 | House | Report of Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife as amended agreed to |
2022-05-03 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 109, Nays = 31 |
2022-05-03 | House | Rep. Dolan of Waitsfield demanded yeas and nays |
2022-05-03 | House | Report of the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations |
2022-05-03 | House | Rep. Feltus of Lyndon recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2022-05-03 | House | Rep. Dolan of Waitsfield reported for the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife |
2022-05-03 | House | Read Second time |
2022-05-03 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-05-02 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-04-29 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-04-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2022-03-31 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Ram Hinsdale, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 1 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-25 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, as amended, agreed to |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Motion disagreed to |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senator Parent motion to commit bill to Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Westman for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Bray for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2022-03-23 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |