VT S0173 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Senate Message, signed by Governor May 31, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Senate Message, signed by Governor May 31, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the State House art collections
Title
An act relating to the State House art collections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Senate Message, signed by Governor May 31, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 31, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 25, 2022 |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-11 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-05-11 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2022-05-11 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-05-11 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-11 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-05-10 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2022-05-10 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-10 | House | Read Third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-10 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-05-09 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-05-09 | House | Report of Committee on Corrections and Institutions agreed to |
2022-05-09 | House | Rep. Townsend of South Burlington recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2022-05-09 | House | Rep. Taylor of Colchester reported for the Committee on Corrections and Institutions |
2022-05-09 | House | Read Second time |
2022-05-09 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-05-07 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-05-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2022-03-16 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Corrections and Institutions |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2022-03-11 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Clarkson for Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-08 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |