VT S0241 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 27, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 27, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Binding Arbitration For State Employees
Title
An Act Relating To Binding Arbitration For State Employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 27, 2014 |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 27, 2014 |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 22, 2014 |
2014-05-09 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Baruth for Committee, text |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-09 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2014-05-09 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2014-05-09 | House | Committee of Conference report agreed to (Senate bill) |
2014-05-09 | House | Rep. Turner of Milton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration |
2014-05-06 | Senate | House message House appointed Conference Committee members |
2014-05-05 | House | Speaker appointed Moran of Wardsboro, Weed of Enosburgh and O'Sullivan of Burlington as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2014-05-05 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed |
2014-05-01 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Baruth, Cummings, and Doyle |
2014-05-02 | Senate | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Mullin |
2014-05-02 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2014-05-02 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2014-05-01 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2014-04-30 | House | Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2014-04-30 | House | Read Third time |
2014-04-29 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-04-29 | House | Amendment of Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs agreed to |
2014-04-29 | House | Rep. Weed of Enosburgh reported for the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs |
2014-04-29 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-04-04 | House | Rep. Sweaney of Windsor moved that the committee on Government Operations be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs which was agreed to. |
2014-04-02 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2014-03-28 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-03-27 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, as amended, agreed to |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Baruth for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2014-03-26 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAppropriations |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEconomic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEconomic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Committee on Government Operations relieved; bill committed to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs on motion of Senator White |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |