VT S0281 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 10, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 10, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Vision Riders And A Choice Of Providers For Vision And Eye Care Services
Title
An Act Relating To Vision Riders And A Choice Of Providers For Vision And Eye Care Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 10, 2014 |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 10, 2014 |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 5, 2014 |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2014-05-05 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2014-05-05 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2014-05-05 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2014-05-03 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2014-05-02 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2014-05-02 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2014-05-02 | House | Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2014-05-02 | House | Read Third time |
2014-05-01 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-05-01 | House | Amendment of Committee on Health Care agreed to |
2014-05-01 | House | Rep. Dakin of Chester reported for the committee on Health Care |
2014-05-01 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-03-13 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2014-03-11 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Mullin for Committee on Finance |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2014-02-27 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Committee on Health and Welfare relieved; bill committed to Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Ayer |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |