WI AB106 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 23-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 23-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.235 (1) (kg), 20.292 (1) (fc), 20.505 (8) (hm) 13t., 38.04 (34) and 39.381 of the statutes; Relating to: grants to technical college and tribal college students for apprenticeship expenses and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Grants to technical college and tribal college students for apprenticeship expenses and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-03-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-17 | House | Representative Knodl added as a coauthor |
2023-03-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development and Economic Opportunities |
2023-03-14 | House | Introduced |