WV HB4345 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 37, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 37, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to repeal the West Virginia Permitting and Licensing Information Act.
Title
Repealing the West Virginia Permitting and Licensing Information Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 360) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 338) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 338) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Chapter 37, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Approved by Governor 3/16/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/16/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/16/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/14/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/14/16 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/14/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 360) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2016-03-03 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-03-03 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-03-03 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 338) |
2016-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-02 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-29 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-29 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-27 | House | Do pass |
2016-02-22 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-02-22 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2016-02-01 | House | To House Government Organization |
2016-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-01 | House | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2016-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB260 (Similar To) 2016-01-13 - To Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5A | 6A | 1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5A | 6A | 2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5A | 6A | 3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5A | 6A | 4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5A | 6A | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5A | 6A | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5A | 6A | 7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5A | 6A | 8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5A | 6A | 9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |