WV SB29 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 2, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 2, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Tolling statute of limitations in certain cases
Title
Tolling statute of limitations in certain cases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 301) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 376) (Y: 74 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 55) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 376) (Y: 74 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 55) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 2, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/16 |
2016-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/11/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/11/16 |
2016-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 301) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 376) |
2016-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-04 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-03 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-03-03 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-02 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2016-02-08 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-02-08 | House | To Judiciary |
2016-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 55) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-03 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2016-01-13 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-01-13 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 2 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |