WY HB0096 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Assigned Chapter Number 138
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Assigned Chapter Number 138
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to highways and bridges; designating a bridge as specified; providing for signage; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Dr. Leonard L. Robinson memorial bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-24 | Assigned Chapter Number 138 | |
2020-03-24 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0066 | |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0066 |
2020-03-10 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0066 |
2020-03-10 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0066 | |
2020-03-10 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-06 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-03-05 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-26 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-25 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-24 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-02-20 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 58-1-1-0-0 |
2020-02-07 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-03 | Bill Number Assigned |