WY HB0143 | 2024 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to psychology and behavior analysts; authorizing family members to deliver behavior analyst services to a recipient as specified; authorizing caregivers or family members to act as behavior technicians as specified; providing rulemaking authority; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Practice of behavior analyst and technician-family members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor 57-4-1-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2024-02-23 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2024-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor 57-4-1-0-0 |
2024-02-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-09 | Bill Number Assigned |