WY SF0033 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to ad valorem taxation; specifying the appeal process for property assessment; providing for the hearing conducted by the county board of equalization; providing rulemaking authority; repealing a duplicative provision; making conforming amendment; and providing for an effective date.
Title
County board of equalization-2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - Senate - S Recedes from Nonconcurrence (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - S Adopted SF0033JC01 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 0 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - H03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - S03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S03 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - S Adopted SF0033JC01 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 0 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - H03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - S03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S03 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2014-03-10 | Governor Signed SEA0044 | |
2014-03-04 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0044 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0044 |
2014-03-04 | Assigned Number SEA0044 | |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Recedes from Nonconcurrence |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Adopted SF0033JC01 |
2014-02-28 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Did Not Concur |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-26 | Amendment Adopted | |
2014-02-25 | House | Passed CoW |
2014-02-25 | Amendment Adopted | |
2014-02-25 | Amendment Adopted | |
2014-02-25 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2014-02-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-24 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2014-02-19 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 |
2014-02-18 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-12-31 | Bill Number Assigned |